HI HCR56 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR56
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Each County To Examine The Feasibility Of Using Downdraft Gasification To Convert Waste Into Fuel And Biochar.
Title
Urging Each County To Examine The Feasibility Of Using Downdraft Gasification To Convert Waste Into Fuel And Biochar.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-28 | House | Offered |
2020-02-27 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR41 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HCR56 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR56 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=56&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR56_.HTM |