HI HCR50 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR50

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Mizuno, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (9).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging An Increase In The Stipend Amounts Of Election Day Officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging An Increase In The Stipend Amounts Of Election Day Officials.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Mizuno, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (9).
2018-03-23HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-21HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, McDermott.
2018-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 3:00PM in conference room 325.
2018-03-13HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39
2018-03-02HouseOffered
2018-03-01HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR38 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Mizuno, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (9).
HCR50 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Recommitted to JDL.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback