HI HCR50 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Recommitted to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The United States Congress To Convene A Limited-purpose Convention To Restore Free And Fair Elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The United States Congress To Convene A Limited-purpose Convention To Restore Free And Fair Elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateRecommitted to JDL.
2017-04-21SenateOne Day Notice 04-24-17.
2017-04-21SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2017-04-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2017-04-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-17 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-07SenateReferred to JDL.
2017-04-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 437).
2017-04-06HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2017-04-06HouseAdopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3).
2017-04-06HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1660) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
2017-04-04HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro.
2017-03-31HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:15PM in conference room 325.
2017-02-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 23
2017-02-17HouseOffered
2017-02-16HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR25 (Same As) 2017-04-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback