HI HCR49 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR49
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Lease Covering State Submerged Lands At Pier 27 In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, To Atlantis Submarines Hawaii, Llc.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Lease Covering State Submerged Lands At Pier 27 In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, To Atlantis Submarines Hawaii, Llc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 816). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1732), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 330). |
2021-03-30 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-30 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2021-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-19-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 974) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-03-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-11-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 19 |
2021-03-04 | House | Offered |
2021-02-25 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR49 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.