HI HCR46 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Sale Of State Lands At Hanapepe, Waimea, Kauai, For Residential Purposes.
Title
Authorizing The Sale Of State Lands At Hanapepe, Waimea, Kauai, For Residential Purposes
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 587). | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) One Day Notice 04-16-10. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Waived referral to WTL. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-15-10 3:40PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-10 3:40PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Re-Referred to WTL. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to WTL/WAM. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 545). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with Representative(s) Berg, Choy voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Deferred one day 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: Awana, Sagum; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Aquino, C. Lee, Ward. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-10 10:00AM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Sagum. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 02-08-10 9:15am in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 11 | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2010-01-25 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR71 (Same As) 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66