HI SCR71 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Sale Of State Lands At Hanapepe, Waimea, Kauai, For Residential Purposes.
Title
Authorizing The Sale Of State Lands At Hanapepe, Waimea, Kauai, For Residential Purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) One Day Notice 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Waived referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2887), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Fukunaga, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL will hold a public decision making on 03-22-10 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-05-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-10 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Offered. |