HI HCR41 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR41
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Amend The United States Code To Permit All Retired, Disabled Veterans To Receive Concurrent Retirement And Disability Payments.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Amend The United States Code To Permit All Retired, Disabled Veterans To Receive Concurrent Retirement And Disability Payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-13 | House | Offered |
2020-02-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR41 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Concurrent Disability and Retirement Payments
Disabled Veterans
Retired Veterans
United States Congress
Veterans Affairs
Disabled Veterans
Retired Veterans
United States Congress
Veterans Affairs
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=41&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR41_.HTM |