HI HCR246 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the Department of Human Services to explore the possibility of allowing government agencies providing government assistance to conduct random drug testing of adult individuals receiving public assistance and suspending this assistance if the individual tests positive for substance abuse.
Title
Urging the Department of Human Services to explore the possibility of allowing government agencies providing government assistance to conduct random drug testing of adult individuals receiving public assistance and suspending this assistance if the individual tests positive for substance abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-28-11 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR209 (Same As) 2011-03-28 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=246 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR246_.HTM |