HI HCR24 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR24
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health And The Hawaii Opioid Initiative To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Limited Access To Prevention And Treatment Services For Opioid And Other Substance Abuse Disorders.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health And The Hawaii Opioid Initiative To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Limited Access To Prevention And Treatment Services For Opioid And Other Substance Abuse Disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. Lei Learmont [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Andria Tupola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1733-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-20 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 44 |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2018-02-09 | House | Offered |
2018-02-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR24 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).