HI HCR24 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending The Deadline For The Home For Life Task Force To Report Its Findings And Recommendations For Reducing Barriers To Aging In Place And Facilitating Multigenerational Living.
Title
Home for Life Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 656). | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) One Day Notice 04-21-11. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Waived referral to HMS/WAM. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Referred to HMS/WAM. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 576). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, M. Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-05-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Re-referred to HLT/HUS, referral sheet 56 | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397), recommending referral to LMG. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Pine. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Pine. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Friday, 04-01-11 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, LMG, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2011-01-27 | (H) To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=24 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR24_.HTM |