HI HCR213 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 757) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 757) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Energy Office To Convene A Renewable Liquid Fuels Working Group To Study Local Production, Development, And Incentives For Renewable Liquid Fuels.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Energy Office To Convene A Renewable Liquid Fuels Working Group To Study Local Production, Development, And Incentives For Renewable Liquid Fuels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 757) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-24. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3913) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 647). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9). |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR193 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.