HI HCR19 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hosptials Within The State Of Hawaii To Increase The Rates Of Exclusive Breastfeeding At Hosptial Discharge.
Title
Breastfeeding at Hospital Discharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-01-13 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 12 |
2013-01-24 | House | Offered |
2013-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR14 (Same As) 2013-02-13 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=19&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR19_.htm |