HI HCR151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR151
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Taxation To Conduct A Study To Determine The Potential New Revenue For The State Resulting From A Tax On Electronic Smoking Devices.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Taxation To Conduct A Study To Determine The Potential New Revenue For The State Resulting From A Tax On Electronic Smoking Devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR151 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 27
HCR151 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SCR86 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to WAM.
HCR151 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SCR86 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=151&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR151_.HTM |