HI HCR143 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR143
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Develop A Master Plan For The Hilo International Aerospace And Technology Park.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Develop A Master Plan For The Hilo International Aerospace And Technology Park.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-26 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 718). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-26-17. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1733) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1691), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-21-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-17 2:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 425). |
2017-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-22-17 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR143 (Carry Over) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR94 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
HR94 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=143&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR143_.HTM |