HI HCR136 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study To Determine The Different Types Of Closed Primaries Conducted By Other States And The Corresponding Effect On Voter Turnout.
Title
Requesting a study of the types of closed primaries and their effect on voter turnout.
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1314), recommending referral to LMG. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Thielen; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-31-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Referred to JUD, LMG, referral sheet 39 | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-15 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR116 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=136 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR136_.HTM |