HI HCR133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Financial Analysis Of The Managed Care Organizations That Administer The Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund By Auditing The Amounts Paid For Health Care And Amounts Paid For Administrative Services.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Financial Analysis Of The Managed Care Organizations That Administer The Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund By Auditing The Amounts Paid For Health Care And Amounts Paid For Administrative Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR133 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 27
HCR133 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 25
SCR239 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to GVO/LCA.
HCR133 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 25
SCR239 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to GVO/LCA.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=133&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR133_.HTM |