HI HCR130 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR130
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging State Agencies To Evaluate, Collaborate, And Implement Best Management Practices, Technologies, And Regulations To Address Vessel Biofouling In Hawaii Harbors.
Title
Urging State Agencies To Evaluate, Collaborate, And Implement Best Management Practices, Technologies, And Regulations To Address Vessel Biofouling In Hawaii Harbors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 704). |
2018-05-01 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Onishi, Takumi excused (2). |
2018-05-01 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 823) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported from GVO/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3810) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Keith-Agaran. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-18 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO/TRE. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 437). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1786-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane. |
2018-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR130 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).