HI HCR127 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Resources Development To Establish A Task Force To Examine How The Compensation Of State And County Employees In The State Compares With That Of Government Employees In Other States And Jurisdictions And That Of The Private Sector In The State.
Title
State Employee Compensation; Comparison with Other Jurisdictions
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Har, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-11 9:15AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39 | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-14 | (H) To be offered. |