HI HCR124 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to TIA/JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to TIA/JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Conduct A Study Of Vehicle Immobilization As A Sanction For Operating A Motor Vehicle With A License Revoked Or Suspended For Operating A Vehicle Under The Influence Of An Intoxicant.
Title
Driving Illegally with Revoked License
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] |
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to TIA/JDL. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 591). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1744-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320-12), recommending referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Yamashita, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Johanson. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR95 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.