HI HCR119 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Properly Support The Small Business Regulatory Review Board Of The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism In Assisting Hawaii's Small Businesses.
Title
Small Business Regulatory Review Board
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Pine. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 03-29-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR90 (Same As) 2012-03-15 - (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 47