HI HCR118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR118
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hospitals And Other Medical Centers In Hawaii, Such As State Hospitals, Tripler Army Medical Center, The Queen's Health Systems Hospitals, Hawaii Pacific Health Hospitals, And Kaiser Permanente Hospitals, To Give A Hiring Preference To Newly Licensed Nurses To Create More Employment Opportunities For Graduates Of Nursing Schools In Hawaii.
Title
Urging Hospitals And Other Medical Centers In Hawaii, Such As State Hospitals, Tripler Army Medical Center, The Queen's Health Systems Hospitals, Hawaii Pacific Health Hospitals, And Kaiser Permanente Hospitals, To Give A Hiring Preference To Newly Licensed Nurses To Create More Employment Opportunities For Graduates Of Nursing Schools In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR99 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR118 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR118 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=118&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR118_.HTM |