HI HCR117 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The County Of Maui To Adopt A Financially Prudent Budget For Fiscal Year 2024-2025 That Maintains Current Operational Levels Except For Certain Mandatory Or Critical Increases.
Title
Urging The County Of Maui To Adopt A Financially Prudent Budget For Fiscal Year 2024-2025 That Maintains Current Operational Levels Except For Certain Mandatory Or Critical Increases.
Sponsors
Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Marten voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Amato, Belatti, Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, La Chica, Lowen, Matsumoto, Perruso, Poepoe, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1743-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Cochran, Poepoe; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto. |
2024-03-28 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2024-03-15 | House | Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to TRN/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
2024-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR98 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.