HI HCR111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Asserting That Racism Is A Public Health Crisis And Urging The State To Commit To Recognizing And Addressing The Resulting Inequities.
Title
Asserting That Racism Is A Public Health Crisis And Urging The State To Commit To Recognizing And Addressing The Resulting Inequities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 366). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1548), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-22 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-22-21 2:15PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR111 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JDC.