HI HCR110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR110
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Sister-state Committee To Evaluate And Develop Recommendations For The Initiation Of A Sister-state Relationship With The Auckland Region, New Zealand.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Sister-state Committee To Evaluate And Develop Recommendations For The Initiation Of A Sister-state Relationship With The Auckland Region, New Zealand.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4). |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1532-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:40AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR106 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4).
HCR110 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to GVO, CPN.
HCR110 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to GVO, CPN.