HI HCR110 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR110
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Auditor To Perform An Audit On The Procedures For And Determinations On Applications For Geographic Exceptions Within The Department Of Education.
Title
Requesting The State Auditor To Perform An Audit On The Procedures For And Determinations On Applications For Geographic Exceptions Within The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR91 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR110 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR110 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=110&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR110_.HTM |