HI HCR11 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Johanson, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Johanson, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Establish A Commission Regarding The Early Settlers Of African Ancestry And Their Hawaiian African Descendants.
Title
Early Settlers of African Ancestry; Hawaiian African Descendants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Johanson, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-04 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2016-01-27 | House | Offered |
2016-01-25 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=11&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR11_.HTM |