HI HB983 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Act 124, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Act 124, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "public servant" in section 701-108, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to clarify the scope and applicability of provisions related to the time limitations to bring prosecution based on misconduct in office. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Time Limitations.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Senate | Act 124, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225). |
2023-06-23 | House | Act 124, on 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225). |
2023-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890). |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1). |
2023-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 874). |
2023-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-23. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 804) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1823) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-05-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1229) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to LBT, JDC. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 190). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-17 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2023-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-17-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1281 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LBT, JDC.