HI HB983 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the spouse and child abuse special fund to allow up to a certain amount of federal reimbursements received from the United States Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families, in the year following the fiscal year in which Family First Prevention Services funds and the Title IV-E funds were expended to be deposited and retained. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Spouse And Child Abuse Special Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 610) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1137 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
HB983 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
HB983 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).