HI HB983 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 237D-6.5 to increase the distribution of state tax revenues to support natural resources programs, replaces the fixed appropriation amount with a percent distribution to each county.
Title
Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB983 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1209 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PSM/WTL/EET, WAM.
SB1209 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PSM/WTL/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=983&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB983_.HTM |