HI HB975 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies application of State Ethics Code to technology transfer arrangements supported by the University of Hawaii. (HB975 HD1)
Title
State Ethics Code; University of Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Matsumoto. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HED, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1144 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.