HI HB965 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms chapter 236E, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2014, and makes technical, nonsubstantive changes.
Title
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1134 (Same As) 2015-05-04 - Act 023, on 5/1/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=965&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB965_.HTM |