HI SB1134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Act 023, on 5/1/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Act 023, on 5/1/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms chapter 236E, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2014, and makes technical, nonsubstantive changes.
Title
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Act 023, on 5/1/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Act 023, 5/1/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1517), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 39). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB965 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1134&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1134_.HTM |