HI HB940 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 019, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 019, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Chapter 328J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to prohibit the use of electronic smoking devices in places where smoking is prohibited. (HB940 HD1)
Title
Regulation of Tobacco Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Act 019, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Act 019, 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2015-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 589). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kahele . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1484) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee on CPN will reconsider its previous decision made on 04-01-15 and will hold a public decision making on 04-09-15 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 251). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Creagan, Fukumoto Chang, Jordan, Kawakami, Keohokalole, Oshiro, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-13-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-04 | House | Re-referred to HLT, referral sheet 8 |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1109 (Same As) 2015-02-13 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.