HI HB938 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Department of Agriculture to provide grants and loans to ranchers and farmers negatively affected by natural disasters through an Agricultural Disaster Funds Program. (HB938 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19 10:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 11:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB938 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB1148 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 152, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).
SB1148 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 152, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).