HI HB937 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 203, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an appropriation for the Executive Office on Early Learning to enter into contracts with third-party providers for family-child interaction learning programs. (HB937 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Early Learning.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseAct 203, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
2017-07-12SenateAct 203, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 169).
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 169) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; K. Kahele.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Har, Matsumoto.
2017-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584).
2017-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-07HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-06SenateOne Day Notice 04-07-17.
2017-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1478) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai.
2017-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2017-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2017-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 165).
2017-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
2017-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-02-14HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-08HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB711 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback