HI HB935 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB935

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of guaranteed monthly compensation required to exempt an individual from minimum wage, overtime, and record keeping requirements under the Hawaii wage and hour law. Establishes a formula for calculation of the guaranteed monthly compensation that ties the guaranteed monthly compensation to the applicable minimum wage. Removes exemptions for automobile salespersons and golf caddies from the wage and hour law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Wage And Hour Law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1117 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
HB935 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback