HI SB1117 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1117

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of guaranteed monthly compensation required to exempt an individual from minimum wage, overtime, and record keeping requirements under the Hawaii wage and hour law. Establishes a formula for calculation of the guaranteed monthly compensation that ties the guaranteed monthly compensation to the applicable minimum wage. Removes exemptions for automobile salespersons and golf caddies from the wage and hour law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Wage And Hour Law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17SenateRe-Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-27SenateReferred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
2017-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB935 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB1117 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback