HI HB922 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to make a decision on disputes regarding treatment plans and continued medical services without a hearing, upon the mutual consent of both parties. (HD2)
Title
Workers' Compensation Medical Treatment; Decisions Without a Hearing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 52). |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 02-19-13. |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1153 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL, WAM.