HI HB899 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB899
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the eligibility of organizations that can receive Community-based Economic Development (CBED) technical assistance from not just community-based organizations (non-profits), but also includes businesses, particularly those that currently have CBED loans or may apply for a CBED loan in the future.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community-based Economic Development Technical And Financial Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB899 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1053 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Act 109, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
SB1053 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Act 109, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=899&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB899_.HTM |