HI HB893 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Improve the effectiveness of Hawaii biosecurity program by establishing the program as a function of the whole Department of Agriculture. The improvement of Hawaii biosecurity goes beyond the confines of the plant quarantine branch and often also includes other groups both inside and outside of state government.
Title
Biosecurity program; objectives; general actions; and program charges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1062 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 3:40PM in conference room 224.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=893&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB893_.HTM |