HI HB887 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 068, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 068, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a separate offense for those who provide anything of value to engage in sexual conduct with another. Specifies that the offense of sex trafficking may be prosecuted at any time. Specifies that sex trafficking includes advancing or profiting from prostitution by certain means, including through coercion. Makes a person strictly liable for sex trafficking of a minor in terms of the victim's age. Renames offenses involving the solicitation of prostitution to use the more appropriate term of commercial sexual exploitation. Amends the elements for commission of the offense of commercial sexual exploitation of a minor and increases the grade of offense to a class B felony. Includes anything of value as a type of compensation for purposes of engaging in prostitution or other offenses involving commercial sexual exploitation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Crime.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Act 068, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Act 068, 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 45). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 45) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Rhoads, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-21 4:30PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809). |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-21 2:30PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Misalucha. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima Chair; Matayoshi, Ward. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 721) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1654) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-07-21 10:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-01-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 259). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 756) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1041 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.