HI HB878 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB878

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts construction procurements from section 103D-1002, Hawaii Revised Statutes, as it applies to construction procurements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hawaii Products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-10HouseThe committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21.
2021-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference.
2021-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1032 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB878 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback