HI HB878 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB878
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts construction procurements from section 103D-1002, Hawaii Revised Statutes, as it applies to construction procurements.
Title
Relating To Hawaii Products.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB878 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1032 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
SB1032 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=878&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB878_.HTM |