HI HB87 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 145, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 145, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the petty misdemeanor crime of criminal trespass in the second degree to include a person who enters or remains unlawfully in or upon the premises of a public housing project or state low-income housing project after a reasonable request or warning to leave by housing authorities or a police officer; provided that no warning or request is necessary when property is closed and signage appropriately placed and using certain letter size provides notification of closure. Effective January 1, 2014. (HB87 CD1)
Title
Criminal Trespass; Public Housing Project
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 145, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248). |
2013-06-25 | House | Act 145, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 32). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 32) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Hee, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Taniguchi. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Rhoads, Carroll, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 700). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | House | House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Carroll, Ward. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 884) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-11-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 22). |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Fale, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Nishimoto excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Wooley. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-13 2:02PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-28-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |