HI HB866 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB866
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to restore diagnostic, preventive, and restorative dental benefits to adult medicaid enrollees, provided the department of human services obtains maximum federal matching funds available and purses all funding sources, including private grants, prior to expending any general fund appropriations.
Title
Relating To Medicaid Benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB866 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1294 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HMS, WAM.
SB1294 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HMS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=866&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB866_.HTM |