HI HB864 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Hawaii housing finance and development corporation to guarantee loans made by commercial lenders to developers for the financing of transit-oriented development projects that include affordable housing.
Title
Loan Guaranty Program for Transit Oriented Development
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Joseph Bertram [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-09-09 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, HSG/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=864&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB864_.HTM |