HI HB850 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB850
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale of polystyrene foam food service containers and the sale or service of food using polystyrene containers statewide. Authorizes the Department of Health to adopt rules for implementation including for enforcement, exemptions, and consumer education. (HB850 HD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB850 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
SB769 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
SB769 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.