HI HB840 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB840
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a performance audit of the Department of Land and Natural Resources, Land Division. Appropriates funds for necessary staff positions. (HB840 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 878), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB840 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.