HI HB832 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB832
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a road connectivity task force to assess and identify ways of improving road access in rural areas and in subdivisions with substandard roads. Requires a report to the legislature.
Title
Relating To Roads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB832 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=832&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB832_.HTM |