HI HB824 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MedQUEST and Medicaid coverage for chiropractic care limited to 24 visits per calendar year. Appropriates funds. (HB824 HD1)
Title
Chiropractic Care; Med-Quest; Medicaid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Finnegan. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 02-12-09 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |